MS HB812 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics To Establish And Maintain A Searchable Public Website Which Includes Certain Information Regarding Property That Is Seized By A Law Enforcement Agency; To Provide That Each Seizing Law Enforcement Agency Shall Provide The Applicable Information Required By This Act To The District Attorney; To Require Each District Attorney To Upload The Applicable Information Required By This Act To The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics Website; To Require The Website To Be Designed In A Manner That Allows The Information To Be Uploaded To The Website; To Outline The Information Required To Be Uploaded To The Website; To Provide That The Website Shall Be Created And Functional No More Than 12 Months From The Date That The Legislature Appropriates Sufficient Funds For Such Purposes; To Provide A Required Time Period For A Seizing Law Enforcement Agency To Provide The Applicable Information To The District Attorney Of The County In Which The Property Was Seized; To Provide The Time Period Required For A District Attorney To Upload The Required Information On The Website; To Authorize The Commander Of A Multijurisdictional Taskforce To Appoint One Agency To Report Its Seizures To The District Attorney Of The County In Which The Property Was Seized; To Provide The Definition For Law Enforcement Agency; To Provide That Failure To Substantially Comply With This Act Shall Disqualify The Seizing Law Enforcement Agency From Applying For Or Receiving Federal Or State Grants; To Require The Seizing Law Enforcement Agency To Request The District Attorney Of The County In Which The Property Is Seized Or The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics To Prosecute Cases Involving Seized Property; To Amend Section 41-29-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Procedure For Obtaining A Seizure Warrant; To Require The Seizing Law Enforcement Agency To Obtain A Seizure Warrant From A Circuit Or County Judge Having Jurisdiction Within 72 Hours Of Any Seizure; To Amend Sections 41-29-157, 41-29-176, 41-29-177, 41-29-183 And 41-29-179, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Civil Asset Forfeiture; revise regulations regarding.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2017-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-01 | House | Amended |
2017-01-17 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |