MS HB806 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration Acting On Behalf Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Convey And Transfer Certain Real Property Located In Alcorn County, Mississippi, To The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Corinth, Mississippi, And Alcorn County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcorn County MDOC property; authorize DFA to transfer certain to City of Corinth, MS and Alcorn County, MS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-26SenateDR - TSDPAA: PP To FI
2018-02-12SenateReferred To Public Property;Finance
2018-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-06HousePassed
2018-01-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-11HouseReferred To Public Property

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback