MS HB804 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-573, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That During Municipal Elections, An Affidavit Voter Who Is Casting An Affidavit Ballot Because The Voter Is Unable To Present An Acceptable Form Of Photo Identification Shall Return To The Municipal Clerk's Office Within Five Business Days Of The Date Of The Election To Present An Acceptable Form Of Photo Identification, A Mississippi Voter Identification Card, Or To File An Affidavit Of Religious Objection In Order To Have His Or Her Vote Counted; To Bring Forward Section 23-15-563, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Voter Identification Requirement, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Voter identifications; provide procedure for presenting in municipal elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2018-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |