MS HB8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 456, Laws Of 2014, Which Authorized The University Of Mississippi Medical Center, With The Approval Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Lease A Certain Portion Of Its Property That Is Located In The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, For A Term Of No More Than 40 Years, To Revise The Leasing Authority By Removing The Requirements That Such Real Property Shall Consist Of Mixed-used Development Improvement And The Minimum Square Footage Of Designated Street-level Office Space; And For Related Purposes.
Title
UMMC property; revise leasing authority by removing certain minimum requirements of improvements to development.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Gunn [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Shanda Yates [I] | Rep. Gene Newman [R] |
Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] | Rep. Ronnie Crudup [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred To Public Property |