MS HB798 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-26-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Provision That Authorizes The Issuance Of A Temporary License To Applicants For Licensure As A Physician Assistant Who Meet All Licensure Requirements Except For The Master's Degree Upon Proof Of Enrollment In A Master's Program That Will Meet The Master's Degree Requirement; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants; delete repealer on authority for issuance of temporary license to applicants in master's degree program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Approved by Governor
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12SenatePassed
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback