MS HB793 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-13-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Transmitted To Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 75-35-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is A Provision Of The "mississippi Meat Inspection Law Of 1968," To Provide That Any Food Product Containing Cell-cultured Animal Tissue Or Plant-based Or Insect-based Food Product Shall Not Be Labeled As Meat Or As A Meat Product; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Artificial meat; prohibit meat produced or cultured from animal tissue and plant-or insect-based food products from being labeled as meat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-01-23HousePassed
2019-01-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Agriculture

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback