MS HB792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 81-22-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Certain For-profit Debt Management Service Providers From The Definition Of "debt Management Service Provider" Under The Mississippi Debt Management Services Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Debt Management Services Act; exclude certain debt management service providers from the definition of "debt management service provider" under.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |