MS HB786 | 2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


An Act To Create The "mississippi Church Protection Act"; To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 97-37-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The List Of Defenses For A Person Indicted Or Charged For A Violation Of The Provision Of Law Regulating The Use Of Firearms; To Amend Section 97-3-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Killing A Person While Acting As A Participant Of A Church Or Place Of Worship Security Team Is Justifiable Homicide; To Prohibit Enforcement Of Unconstitutional Federal Rules And Orders; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


"Mississippi Church Protection Act"; create.


Roll Calls

2016-04-05 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 85 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2016-04-15 Approved by Governor
2016-04-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-05HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2016-03-31SenateReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-31SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-03-29SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2016-03-29SenatePassed As Amended
2016-03-17SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2016-03-11SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2016-02-19HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-02-17HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-11HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

Bill Comments