MS HB782 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-37-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Certificate Of Rehabilitation For A Person Who Was Convicted Of Felony Out Of State Or Who Was Convicted Under Federal Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Certificate of rehabilitation; authorize those convicted in another state to apply for a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |