MS HB782 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit Enforcement Of Certain Laws Regarding Firearms, Accessories Or Ammunition; To Provide Penalties For State Officials, Agents Or Employees Who Violate This Act; To Provide That This Act Does Not Apply To The Enforcement Of Federal Law For The Sole Purpose Of Transferring Firearms; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; prohibit enforcement of certain federal law relating to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateDied In Committee
2016-03-11SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2016-03-02HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-03-01HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-02-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Myers, Gipson, Hood)
2016-02-29HousePassed
2016-02-29HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-25HouseRead the Third Time
2016-02-18HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback