MS HB775 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-17-11 And 73-17-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Educational And Experience Requirements In Order To Be Eligible For A Nursing Home Administrator's License; To Require Criminal Background Checks For Applicants; To Prescribe The Fees Charged By The Board For Licensure And For Examinations; To Delete The Requirement That A Copy Of All Documentation Pertaining To An Investigation Be Provided To The Licensee Before A Hearing; To Authorize The Board To Assess The Reasonable Costs Associated With The Investigation And Disciplinary Proceeding Against A Licensee; To Amend Sections 73-22-1 And 73-22-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Orthotists And Prosthetists Who Have Been Certified By The Board For Orthotist/prosthetist Certification To Practice In Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nursing home administrators licensure law; revise educational and experience requirements and complaint procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 101 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conferees Named Bryan,Dearing,Jackson (15th) | |
2011-03-21 | Conferees Named Holland,Scott,Moak | |
2011-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-14 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |