MS HB773 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section Mississippi Code Of 1972, To 37-13.80.2, To Require The State Department Of Education To Provide A Biannual Report To The Director Of The Mississippi Youth Challenge Academy Containing Information Of The Identity, Last Known Address And Last Date Of Attendance Of Students Between The Ages Of 16 And 18 Years Of Age Who Are Presumed To Have Dropped Out Of School In Each School District; To Require School Districts To Provide Written Notice To Parents And Certain Students Of The Disclosure Of Information And An Opportunity To Object To Said Disclosure; To Require The Director Of The Youth Challenge Academy To Certify The Nondisclosure Of Information To Third Parties Except Those Individuals Employed By The Program For Recruitment And Retention Of Students; To Amend Section 43-27-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Youth Challenge Academy; require SDE to provide certain information to director of for purposes of dropout prevention.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2016-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-22 | House | DR - TSDP: JB To ED |
2016-02-17 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To JB |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Education;Judiciary B |