MS HB773 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-977, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Procedures To Be Followed If Only One Person Has Qualified As A Candidate For A Judicial Office And That Person Dies, Resigns Or Is Otherwise Disqualified From Holding That Office Before The General Election; To Amend Section 23-15-365, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Nonpartisan Judicial Elections From The Provision Of Law Regarding Write-in Ballots; To Amend Sections 23-15-833 And 23-15-849, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise How Vacancies For Circuit And Chancery Court Judges Are Filled; To Provide A Procedure For Creation Of A Temporary County Executive Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial candidates; revise procedures for certain vacancies.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. Blaine Eaton [D] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] |
Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] | Rep. Johnny Stringer [D] | Rep. Joe Warren [D] | Rep. Percy Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Burton,Dickerson,Fillingane | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Reynolds,Warren,Wooten | |
2011-03-09 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-28 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Referred To Elections | |
2011-02-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-09 | Amended | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-14 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |