MS HB772 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Youth Court Judge To Appoint Counsel To Represent An Indigent Parent Or Guardian And To Require Appointed Counsel To Receive Annual Training; To Amend Section 99-18-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Representation Of Indigent Parents Or Guardians By The State Defender; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth court; authorize counsel to represent indigent parent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13 Approved by Governor
2016-04-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-26HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-20SenateConference Report Adopted
2016-04-19HouseConference Report Adopted
2016-04-18HouseConference Report Filed
2016-04-18SenateConference Report Filed
2016-04-15SenateConferees Named Bryan,McDaniel,Wiggins
2016-04-14HouseConferees Named Gipson,Hood,Dixon
2016-04-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2016-03-31SenateReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-29SenatePassed As Amended
2016-03-29SenateAmended
2016-03-22SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-02-29SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2016-02-18HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-02-17HousePassed
2016-02-11HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback