MS HB770 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Equal Pay Act; To Provide Definitions For "employee", "employer", "wage", "rate", And "unpaid Wages"; To Provide That No Employer Shall Pay An Employee A Wage At A Rate Less Than The Rate At Which An Employee Of The Opposite Sex In The Same Establishment Is Paid For Equal Work On A Job, The Performance Of Which Requires Equal Skill, Effort And Responsibility, And Which Is Performed Under Similar Working Conditions; To Provide Remedies; To Provide The Time In Which A Civil Action Must Be Filed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Equal Pay for Equal Work Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Boyd,Parker |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,White,Tullos |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2022-01-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-01-20 | House | Amended |
2022-01-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |