MS HB769 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate The Wildlife Management Area Formerly Known As The Tuscumbia Wildlife Management Area, The Harvey Moss Wildlife Management Area At Tuscumbia; To Designate The Wildlife Management Area Formerly Known As The Caney Creek Wildlife Management Area, As The Representative Richard L. "dick" Livingston And Dale O. Windham Wildlife Management Area At Caney Creek; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harvey Moss Wildlife Management Area at Tuscumbia; designate Tuscumbia Wildlife Management Area as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Whaley,Suber,Sparks |
2023-03-15 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Holloway,Lancaster |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2023-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Public Property |