MS HB768 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Designate The First Weekend Of "national Fishing And Boating Week" In June Of Each Year As "free Fishing Weekend"; To Provide That Any Person May Saltwater Sport Fish Without A License During "free Fishing Weekend"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Free Fishing Weekend"; designate and authorize exemption from saltwater sport fishing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-07 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-03 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources | |
2011-02-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-07 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | DR - TSDP: WI To MR | |
2011-01-26 | DR - TSDP: MR To WI | |
2011-01-14 | Referred To Marine Resources;Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |