MS HB766 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Department Of Finance And Administration To Purchase Certain Real Property Located Within The Vicinity Of The Capitol Complex In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, For The Use And Benefit Of The Mississippi Fair Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Fair Commission; authorize to purchase certain property located in City of Jackson and contiguous to the State Fairgrounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-01-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Banks, Weathersby, Hale) |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Public Property |