MS HB761 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-26-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase To Fifteen Years The Maximum Period Of Time That The Mississippi Development Authority May Make Payments From The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Fund To An Approved Participant In The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Program; To Bring Forward Section 57-26-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "tourism Project" For Purposes Of The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Program To Include Certain Tourism Attractions Located Within Historic Districts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Fund; increase period of time that MDA may make payments from, revise certain definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To FI |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Finance |
2013-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-31 | House | DR - TSDPCS: WM To TO |
2013-01-30 | House | DR - TSDP: TO To WM |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means |