MS HB760 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Fannie Lou Hamer Cancer Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tallahatchie County; authorize contribution to Fannie Lou Hamer Cancer Foundation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2017-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |