MS HB757 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The State Department Of Education Shall Develop A Statewide School Mobile Panic Button Program For All K-12 Public Schools, And Shall Implement The Program In All K-12 Public Schools Not Later Than One Hundred Twenty Days After The Effective Date Of This Act; To Provide That The Department Must Secure A Statewide Contract With A Technology Provider To Provide That The Department Will Assume The Costs Of Having The System Technology Implemented In All K-12 Public Schools, Using Funds Appropriated By The Legislature For That Purpose; To Specify The Minimum Standards For The Technology Purchased By The Department For The Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School mobile panic button program; require Department of Education to develop and implement in K-12 public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Kevin Felsher [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To ED |
2020-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |