MS HB757 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 37-153-1 Through 37-153-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Constitute The Mississippi Comprehensive Workforce Training And Education Consolidation Act Of 2004; To Create New Section 37-153-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Mississippi Comprehensive Workforce Training And Education Consolidation Act; To Reenact Sections 71-5-5, 71-5-11 And 71-5-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Mississippi Employment Security Law; To Reenact Sections 71-5-101 And 71-5-107 Through 71-5-143, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Transfer The Powers And Responsibilities Of The Mississippi Employment Security Commission To The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security In The Office Of The Governor And Prescribe The Department's Powers And Duties; To Reenact Section 71-5-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes The Mississippi State Employment Service Within The Department Of Employment Security; To Create New Section 71-5-144, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Reenacted Sections 71-5-5, 71-5-11, 71-5-19, 71-5-101 Through 71-5-143 And 71-5-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Mississippi Employment Security Law, The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security And The Mississippi State Employment Service; To Reenact Sections 71-5-357 And 71-5-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prescribe Regulations Governing Nonprofit Organizations, State Agencies And Political Subdivisions Under The Employment Security Law; To Amend Reenacted Section 71-5-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Reenacted Sections 71-5-357 And 71-5-359, Mississippi Code Of 1972; To Reenact Sections 71-5-451 And 71-5-457, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Unemployment Compensation Fund And The Unemployment Trust Fund; To Amend Reenacted Section 71-5-457, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Reenacted Sections 71-5-451 And 71-5-457, Mississippi Code Of 1972; To Reenact Sections 71-5-511, 71-5-513, 71-5-517, 71-5-519, 71-5-523, 71-5-525, 71-5-529, 71-5-531 And 71-5-541, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Payment Of Unemployment Compensation Benefits; To Create New Section 71-5-547, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Reenacted Sections 71-5-511, 71-5-513, 71-5-517, 71-5-519, 71-5-523, 71-5-525, 71-5-529, 71-5-531 And 71-5-541, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Payment Of Unemployment Compensation Benefits; To Reenact Section 73-30-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Excludes Certain Professionals From Regulation Under The Laws Governing Licensed Professional Counselors; To Amend Reenacted Section 73-30-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 43-1-30, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Tanf Implementation Council And Prescribes Its Powers And Duties; To Amend Reenacted Section 43-1-30, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 43-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prescribes The Amount Of Temporary Assistance For Needy Families (tanf) Benefits Which May Be Granted To Recipients; To Amend Reenacted Section 43-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 43-19-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Child Support Unit Established By The Department Of Human Services To Establish A State Parent Locator Service; To Amend Reenacted Section 43-19-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 43-19-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires Employers To Submit Certain Information Relating To Newly Hired Employees To The Directory Of New Hires Within The Department Of Human Services; To Amend Reenacted Section 43-19-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Sections 57-62-5 And 57-62-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To The Mississippi Advantage Jobs Act; To Amend Reenacted Section 57-62-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section And Section 57-62-5; To Reenact Section 57-75-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines Certain Terms Used Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act; To Amend Reenacted Section 57-75-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 57-80-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Growth And Prosperity Act; To Amend Reenacted Section 57-80-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 69-2-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Prescribes Certain Duties Of The Mississippi Cooperative Extension Service Relating To The Dissemination Of Information To The Agricultural Community; To Amend Reenacted Section 69-2-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Reenact Section 7-1-355, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Department Of Employment Security, Office Of The Governor, To Make An Annual Report To The Legislature On Workforce Investment Activities; To Amend Reenacted Section 7-1-355, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify And Extend The Date Of The Repealer On That Section; To Repeal Section 60, Chapter 572, Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Section 58, Chapter 30, Laws Of The First Extraordinary Session Of 2008, As Amended By Section 58, Chapter 559, Laws Of 2010, As Amended By Section 59, Chapter 471, Laws Of 2011, As Last Amended By Section 58, Chapter 515, Laws Of 2012, Which Provides For The Repeal On Those Statutes Reenacted By This Act And Which Is Not Codified; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Comprehensive Workforce Training and Education Act; codify and extend repealers to 2026.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseDied On Calendar
2019-03-11SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-07SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-25SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-06HouseAmended
2019-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-17HouseReferred To Workforce Development

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback