MS HB756 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The Department Of Finance And Administration, Bureau Of Buildings, Grounds And Real Property Management Shall Determine The Estimated Costs To Repair The Walnut Grove Correctional Facility; To Provide That After The Determination Of Costs Is Made, The Bureau Of Buildings, Grounds And Real Property Management Shall Make A Certain Report Detailing The Needed Repairs And The Costs Associated With Such Repairs; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury Designated As The "correctional Facilities Assessment And Evaluation Fund"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Walnut Grove Correctional Facility; require DFA to ascertain certain cost estimates to make repairs at the facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2020-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-02-17 | House | Reconsidered |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Brown (20th), Horan, Mickens) |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred To Corrections |