MS HB753 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-29-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Entities Offering "pure Syrup" Products To Meet The Minimum Requirements Established By The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce, To Require The Listing Of Ingredients Of Certain Syrup Products By Order Of Weight; To Amend Section 75-29-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Agriculture And Commerce To Issue Orders To Stop The Sale Or Distribution Of Syrup In Violation Of The Law; To Create New Section 75-29-204, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Distributors To Keep Record Of The Names And Addresses Of Manufacturers Of The Syrup Distributed For A Period Of Three Years; To Amend Section 75-29-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Imposition Of Administrative And Civil Penalties For Violations; To Repeal Section 75-29-205, 75-29-207 And 75-29-209, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize The Commissioner To Issue An Order To Stop The Sale Or Distribution Of Syrup In Violation Of The Law, Prohibit The Use Of Fictitious Labeling Information And Provide The Commissioner With Authority To Establish Rules And Regulations For The Enforcement Of The Syrup Containers Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Syrup Containers Law; revise to require pure syrup to comply with regulations prescribed for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture |
2013-02-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Agriculture |