MS HB753 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Time Required For Notice Of Election For School District Elections; To Amend Sections 37-7-215 And 37-7-223, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Board Of Trustees, The County Election Commissioners Or Any Other Authorities Conducting School Board Elections To Allow Any Qualified Elector Of The School District Who Is An Actively Deployed Member Of The United States Armed Forces To Vote By Absentee Ballot; To Amend Section 37-7-219, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 37-7-217, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Conduct Of Certain School Board Elections, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School board elections; authorize absentee voting for actively deployed members of United States Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Died On Calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Education | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-02 | DR - TSDP: MA To ED | |
2012-03-01 | DR - TSDP: ED To MA | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Education;Military Affairs |