MS HB752 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-173-1, 37-173-3 And 37-173-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Eligibility For The Mississippi Dyslexia Therapy Scholarship For Students With Dyslexia Program To Include Students In Kindergarten Through Grade 12; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Dyslexia Therapy Scholarship for Students with Dyslexia; revise eligibility beginning with kindergarten.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Rep. Kent McCarty [R] | Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed |
2023-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-31 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2023-01-25 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 173 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 173 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 173 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |