MS HB751 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Commercial Driver's License Act To Exclude From The Definition Of "commercial Motor Vehicle" Any Military And Commercial Equipment Owned Or Operated By The Mississippi Military Department And Operated By Employees Of The Mississippi Military Department; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commercial Driver's License Act; exclude certain equipment operated by Mississippi Military Department from definition of "commercial motor vehicle."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-01-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Military Affairs |