MS HB751 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Eligibility Of Minors For Parole For Capital Crimes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Minors; allow sentencing discretion in capital cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2014-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed |
2014-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |