MS HB74 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 19-5-303, 19-5-313, 19-5-319, 19-5-331, 19-5-333, 19-5-335, 19-5-337, 19-5-339, 19-5-341, 19-5-353, 19-5-357, 19-5-359 And 19-5-361, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Regulate 911 And E911 Emergency Telecommunications Services And Require The Collection Of Service Charges; To Amend Section 19-5-371, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Reenacted Sections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Emergency Telecommunications Services (911); extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 5 | 303 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 313 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 319 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 331 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 333 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 335 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 337 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 339 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 341 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 353 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 357 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 359 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 361 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |