MS HB74 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Not More Than 5 Excused Absences To A Compulsory-school-age Child For Participation In Events Sponsored By The 4-h Or Future Farmers Of America (ffa); To Provide For Excused Absences To A Compulsory-school-age Child For Service As A Legislative Page When The Legislature Is Convened In Session; To Provide That Children Age 5 On Or Before September 1 Of The Calendar Year Who Have Enrolled In Public Kindergarten Are Subject To The Provisions Of The Mississippi Compulsory School Attendance Law; To Amend Section 37-41-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Use Of Public School Buses For The Transportation Of Citizens To Historic Events Held On Military Parks Located Within The School District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Student attendance; allow excused absence for those participating in 4-H & FFA sponsored events not to exceed five per academic year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Collins,Jolly |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Holloway,Clarke |
2013-03-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2013-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-06 | House | Amended |
2013-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Education |