MS HB732 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 41-41-34.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit An Abortion Of An Unborn Human Individual With A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Except To Prevent The Death Of The Pregnant Woman Or To Prevent A Serious Risk Of The Substantial And Irreversible Impairment Of A Major Bodily Function Of The Woman; To Amend Section 73-25-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Physician Performing An Abortion On A Pregnant Woman After Determining That The Unborn Human Individual Has A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Is Subject To License Revocation Or Disciplinary Action; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abortion; prohibit when heartbeat is detected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |