MS HB729 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "mississippi Successful Techniques Resulting In Delivering Excellence In Education And Employability (stride) Scholarship Program" For The Purpose Of Establishing And Making Scholarships Available To Students Who Become Eligible To Participate In The Program For Costs Associated With Dual-credit And Dual-enrollment Option, Career And Technical Education Courses That Lead To Industry Certification And Overload Courses; To Establish The Minimum Qualifications For Each Subsidiary Scholarship Program, To Provide That The Programs Shall Be Respectively Administered By The Mississippi Community College Board And The State Board Of Education; To Amend Sections 37-71-7 And 37-71-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Provisions Of The "mississippi Learn To Earn Act" Pertaining To Application Procedures In A Manner Consistent With The Implementation Of The "mississippi Successful Techniques Resulting In Delivering Excellence In Education And Employability (stride) Scholarship Program"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Successful Techniques Resulting in Delivering Excellence in Education and Employability (STRIDE) Scholarship Program"; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-06 | House | Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 71 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 71 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |