MS HB728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 29-5-215, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Short-term Debt That The Department Of Finance And Administration May Incur To Implement And Administer The Projects In The Capitol Complex Improvement District Secured By The Portion Of The Proceeds Of The Special Sales Tax Allocated To The Capitol Complex Improvement District Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capitol Complex Improvement District; increase amount of short-term debt that DFA may incur to implement and administer projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-21HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-20HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-20HouseAmended
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-17HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback