MS HB722 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Entitled The "right To Try Act"; To Authorize Licensed Physicians To Prescribe Or Recommend Certain Investigational Drugs, Biological Products Or Devices To Certain Eligible Terminally Ill Patients; To Provide Definitions; To Amend Section 73-25-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Investigational drugs; authorize physicians to prescribe to certain eligible terminally ill patients.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] |
Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |