MS HB72 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-25-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Dentists In The Statute That Provides Immunity From Liability For Certain Health Care Providers Who Provide Charitable Health Services Or Provide Health Services Without Charge While Assisting With Emergency Management Or Operations In An Emergency; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentists; provide immunity for providing charitable and emergency services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-03-08SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-03-04SenatePassed
2021-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2021-02-11HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-02-10HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Mims, McGee, Young)
2021-02-10HousePassed
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDP: JA To PH
2021-01-26HouseDR - TSDP: PH To JA
2021-01-07HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services;Judiciary A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
732538Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback