MS HB715 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require Any State Offender Who Has More Than One Hundred Dollars In His Or Her Canteen Fund To Make Restitution, As Ordered By A Court, From The Fund Before Such Offender Is Released From The Custody Of The Department Of Corrections; To Provide Certain Definitions; To Prohibit Certain Transfers From The Canteen Fund Of The Offender If The Offender Is Near His Or Her Release Date; To Amend Sections 99-37-15, 47-5-109 And 99-37-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Canteen funds for state offenders; require restitution to be paid from if court has ordered restitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Corrections |