MS HB710 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-3-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Procedure For Complaints Filed Against The State Regarding The Constitutionality Of Legislative Enactments; To Provide For Appeals; To Amend Section 11-46-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Suits against the state; Supreme Court to have original jurisdiction for claims seeking injunctive relief.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2015-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |