MS HB71 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-9-120, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Timeline For The Approval Or Disapproval Of Contracts Submitted To The Personal Service Contract Review Board For Review; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Personal Service Contract Review Board; revise timeline to review contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed |
2017-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |