MS HB702 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-29-951, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Annual Gross Sales For A Cottage Food Operation From Twenty Thousand Dollars To Thirty-five Thousand Dollars; To Authorize A Cottage Food Operation To Advertise Cottage Food Products Over The Internet, Including Through Social Media; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cottage food operation; increase maximum annual gross sales to $35,000.00 and authorize to advertise over the Internet.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Kenneth Walker [D] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] |
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Gary Staples [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2019-01-24 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-01-23 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wilson, Pigott, Mangold) |
2019-01-23 | House | Passed |
2019-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Agriculture |