MS HB697 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-3-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Public Service Commission Shall Not Regulate Any Eligible Homeowners Association That Is Distributing Water To The Residents Of Its Homeowners Association Regardless If An Association Is Located In An Area That Is Subject To A Certificate Of Public Convenience And Necessity That Is Held By An Eligible Municipality; To Amend Section 77-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Terms "eligible Municipality" And "eligible Homeowners Association"; To Create New Section 77-3-99, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That If An Eligible Home Owners Association Decides To Provide Water Service To Its Residents, Then An Eligible Municipality Must Sell And Convey Water Assets To The Association So That Water Can Be Supplied To Such Residents; To Bring Forward Section 41-26-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Pertains To The Operation Of A Public Water System; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Homeowner associations that provide water to its residents, certain; prohibit PSC from providing certain regulation of.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2023-02-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 26 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2023/pdf/history/HB/HB0697.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2023/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0697IN.htm |