MS HB696 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 29-5-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Boundaries Of The Capitol Complex Improvement District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Capitol Complex Improvement District; revise boundary lines of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2023-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-08 | House | Passed |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-26 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |