MS HB691 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-11-551, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Date Of The Repealer On The Statute Requiring An Insurer Paying An Automobile Insurance Claim To Add The Business Repairing The Automobile And The Lienholder As Payees On The Check To The Insured Party; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Auto insurance; delete repealer on statute requiring repair shop and lienholder as additional payees on check paying claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred To Insurance |