MS HB69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-9-107, Mississippi Code 1972, To Revise The Term "nonstate Service" For Purposes Of The State Personnel System To Include Employees, Excluding Administrative Employees, Of The State Veterans Affairs Board Who Are Employed At Veterans Homes In The State; To Make Technical Amendments Regarding Contracts For Personal Services To Conform To Existing Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Veterans Affairs Board; provide that certain employees of are nonstate service employees under state personnel system.
Sponsors
Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] |
Rep. Brady Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-01-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-01-21 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-01-21 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Amended |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2021-01-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-01-07 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-01-07 | House | Passed |
2021-01-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred To Appropriations |