MS HB685 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 47-5-901 Through 47-5-909, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize And Establish Conditions For The Housing Of State Offenders In County Jails Whenever The Commissioner Of Corrections Determines That Physical Space Is Not Available In The State Correctional Institutions; To Reenact And Amend Section 47-5-901, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Sentencing Court, Sheriff Or President Of The Board Of Supervisors Of A County Where An Inmate Is Convicted To Request From The Department Of Corrections That Such Inmate Serve All Or Part Of His Or Her Sentence In The County Jail; To Provide That Whenever A Denial Is Made Regarding The Request To Have An Inmate Serve His Or Her Sentence In The County Jail, The Commissioner Of Corrections Must Certify In Writing That The Inmate Does Not Qualify To Serve His Or Her Sentence In The County Jail; To Amend Section 47-5-911, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Those Reenacted Code Sections; To Amend Section 47-5-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Corrections To Employ A Deputy Commissioner For Programs, Education, Re-entry, And Vocational Rehabilitation Services; To Provide That The State Parole Board Shall Select Its Administrative Assistant For Parole Matters; To Amend Section 47-5-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Number Of Transitional Center Beds That Must Be Contracted For By The Department Of Corrections; To Authorize The Commissioner To Designate Deputy Commissioners As Peace Officers Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 47-5-471, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Corrections To Reimburse Counties At A Certain Rate For Expenses Related To The Housing And Care Of State Offenders Who Participate In The State-county Work Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State offenders; extend repealer on authority to house in county jails when state space is unavailable.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Turner [R] | Rep. Abe Hudson [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Carl Mickens [D] |
Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Yates, Horan, Mickens) |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Sparks,Suber |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Felsher,Rosebud |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred To Corrections |