MS HB669 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require The Tate County School Board, Having Jurisdiction Over Three High Schools Within The Tate County School District, To Consolidate Its System Of High Schools By Closing Coldwater High School, Which Has Consistently And Chronically Underperformed As Determined By Its Grade Designation Under The Statewide School Accountability Rating System As Determined By The State Board Of Education, Upon The Completion Of The 2019-2020 Scholastic Year; To Provide That Upon Such Closure, Students Then Attending Coldwater High School Shall Have The Discretion To Choose Whether To Attend Either Of The Two Remaining High Schools In The Tate County School District Or Request A Transfer To The Senatobia Municipal School District Based On Residential Proximity To The Appropriate High School Of Attendance Within The Senatobia Municipal School District; To Require The Tate County School Board And The Senatobia Municipal School Board To Enter Into An Agreement Not Later Than July 1, 2020, To Provide For The Automatic Transfer Of Any Students Enrolled In And Attending Coldwater High School At The Time Of Its Closure Seeking Transfer To The Senatobia Municipal School District, As Determined By The Residence Of The Students In Closest Proximity To The Boundary Of The Municipal School District; To Provide That The Attendance Zone Of Coldwater High School Shall Be Collapsed To Be Redrawn And Distributed In Equal Proportion To The Remaining Two High School Attendance Zones In The County School District; To Bring Forward Section 37-7-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tate County School Board; require to consolidate system of high schools by closing Coldwater High School.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Approved by Governor
2020-06-18SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-18HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-15SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-06-15SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-10SenatePassed
2020-05-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Education
2020-03-17HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-12HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-03-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Osborne, Bennett, McCarty)
2020-03-11HousePassed
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-06HouseReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback