MS HB668 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Sections 97-35-29, 97-35-31, 97-35-33, 97-35-35, 97-35-37, 97-35-39 And 97-35-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Definition, Arrest And Penalties For Persons Defined As "tramps"; To Repeal Sections 97-35-41, 99-29-1, 99-29-3, 99-29-5, 99-29-7, 99-29-9, 99-29-11 And 99-29-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Vagrancy Penalties And Proceedings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Vagrants and tramps; repeal laws regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2018-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |