MS HB667 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-5-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The State Board Of Education With The Discretion To Delegate Certain Authority To Receive And Hold Real And Personal Property Or Testamentary Gifts Or Bequests For The Benefit Of The Mississippi School For The Blind And The Mississippi School For The Deaf To Administrative Staff Of The State Department Of Education Of Those Schools; To Amend Section 43-5-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All Administrative And Licensed Instructional Employees Of Msbd To Enter Into Contracts For Terms Of Their Employment; To Require The State Board Of Education To Determine The Qualifications For Those Employees, Who Shall Be Transferred From Under The Authority Of The Mississippi Personnel Board; To Provide For The Retention Of Benefits And Service With The Public Employees' Retirement System And The State And School Employees' Health Insurance Plan; To Provide That Such Employees Shall Be Subject To The Will And Pleasure Of The Respective Superintendents Of Msbd; To Amend Section 43-5-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; To Amend Section 37-39-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include The State Board Of Education Within The Meaning Of The Term "school Board," When Acting On Behalf Of The Msbd; To Amend Section 31-7-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Definitions Of The Terms "agency" And "governing Authority" Under The Public Purchasing Laws To Exempt The Mississippi School For The Blind And The Mississippi School For The Deaf From Certain Requirements Of The Public Procurement Review Board; To Amend Section 37-140-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As It Relates To Personnel Matter For The Mississippi School Of The Arts, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public special purpose schools; clarify provision related to administrative and licensed instructional personnel of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred To Education |