MS HB665 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit The State Board Of Education From Requiring Students To Achieve A Passing Score On End-of-course Tests Administered Under The Subject Area Testing Program As A Requirement For Graduation; To Amend Section 37-16-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Local School Districts From Using The End-of-course Tests To Determine If Students Have Mastered Minimum Academic Skills Required For Graduation; To Amend Sections 37-3-49, 37-16-17 And 37-35-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisons; And For Related Purposes.
Title
End-of-course subject area tests; prohibit mandatory passing scores as requirement for graduation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2015-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-12 | House | Amended |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Education |