MS HB658 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 99-19-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Felony Convictions Eligible For Expungement; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Felony conviction expungements; revise number that one may be eligible for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Vetoed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Wiggins,DeBar,England
2020-06-18HouseConferees Named Bain,Sanford,Owen
2020-06-18HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-16SenateAmended
2020-05-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2020-03-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-11HousePassed As Amended
2020-03-11HouseAmended
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-02-06HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB0658.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0658IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0658PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/0600-0699/HB0658SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/HB0658_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB0658_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/0650006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1620020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750015.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback