MS HB653 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, A Political Subdivision Of The State Or A Municipality Of The State May Form A Public-private Partnership For A Highway, Road, Bridge Or Other Asset Improvement By Which The Department, Political Subdivision Or Municipality May Negotiate For Private Funding Assistance Toward A Highway, Road, Bridge Or Other Asset Improvement In Exchange For Naming Rights Of The Section Of Highway, Road, Bridge Or Other Asset For Which The Private Funding Assistance Was Provided; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Transportation funding; authorize public-private partnerships to include naming rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2020-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |